CDLS - HOPE FOR HASTI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hope for Hasti provides grants to organisations conducting research on Cornelia de Lange Syndrome (CdLS), and guides research projects with the aim of finding treatments for this rare genetic condition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 March 2020: CIO registration
- HOPE FOR HASTI (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Brannigan | Chair | 25 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
SEBASTIAN PEARCE | Trustee | 25 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RUTHERFORD PLAYER | Trustee | 25 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
KEITH GODDARD | Trustee | 25 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hengameh Delfaninejad | Trustee | 25 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £897.10k | £269.68k | £32.17k | £67.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.39k | £108.34k | £23.23k | £25.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £897.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £46 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £25.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £2.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM CORNELIA DE LANGE SYNDROME (CDLS) IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) PROVIDING GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO CORNELIA DE LANGE SYNDROME (CDLS) ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH WILL BE DISSEMINATED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (2) ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING A PATIENT REGISTRY FOR PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CORNELIA DE LANGE SYNDROME (CDLS) ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AS A MEANS TO SUPPORT CLINICAL TRIALS, STUDIES AND RESEARCH INTO THE CONDITION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Bucks Close
WEST BYFLEET
Surrey
KT14 6RU
- Phone:
- 07920162569
- Email:
- hello@hopeforhasti.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window