CYCLING WITHOUT AGE OXFORDSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cycling Without Age Oxfordshire's charitable activities is to provide relief for those who are in need by reason of their old age, restricted mobility or disability through the provision of trishaw ride services and the promotion of such services across Oxfordshire. The charity will operate and maintain trishaws and support volunteers from local communities to safely pilot the trishaws.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kiran Roy Audit | Chair | 06 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr CHRISTIAAN WILLEM SIMON MONDEN | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Williams | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Janet Horrocks | Trustee | 08 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.49k | £12.55k | £1.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.77k | £13.61k | £1.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 218 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 October 2023 | 242 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 October 2023 | 242 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR OLD AGE, RESTRICTED MOBILITY OR DISABILITY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRISHAW RIDE SERVICES AND THE PROMOTION OF SUCH SERVICES ACROSS OXFORDSHIRE AND OTHER REGIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
128 Kennington Road
Kennington
OXFORD
OX1 5PE
- Phone:
- 07771768680
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window