THE CPF TRUST

Charity Number: 1191787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity's objects are to support such legally charitable institutions or purposes as the trustees may from time to time determine. The charity will only accept electronic applications, paper, email or telephone applications will not be considered.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £130,634
Total expenditure: £114,126

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 October 2020: Standard registration
  • 07 February 2023: Funds received from 262468 THE C P F TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Isobel Rachel Pinder Chair 27 February 2020
CATHEDRAL MUSIC TRUST
Received: On time
Jenett Mabella Farrer Trustee 15 June 2020
None on record
Nicola Laura Jean Guthrie Trustee 15 June 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £123.89k £129.12k £130.63k
Total expenditure £97.59k £99.35k £114.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 02 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 02 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 23 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 17 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
6 Priory Avenue
Bedford Park
London
W4 1TX
Phone:
02089946052