SEN PARENTING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing training and supports for families with children and young people with special educational needs. Training is provided in the form of workshops via online sessions and face to face small group sessions. Families are provided with one to one support and advise through face to face meetings with professionals and links with other voluntary organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 18 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Florence Frimpong | Chair | 30 March 2021 |
|
|||||
JACOB OPOKU-MANU | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Afiba Boateng | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.38k | £3.08k | £3.00k | £3.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.14k | £1.18k | £2.67k | £4.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.50k | £2.48k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AND SUPPORT PARENTS AND CARERS OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS (SEN), IN PARTICULAR BY: · PROVIDING TRAINING FOR PARENTS AND CARERS OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS (SEN) TO ENABLE THEM TO UNDERSTAND THEIR CHILDREN’S DISABILITIES AND LEARN SKILLS TO SUPPORT THEIR DEVELOPMENT FROM EARLY YEARS TO ADULT LIFE; · SUPPORTING PARENTS AND CARERS IN SETTING UP SPECIAL NEEDS SYSTEMS WITHIN THEIR HOME ENVIRONMENT TO BRIDGE THE GAP BETWEEN SCHOOLS, PROFESSIONALS AND HOME; · CREATING AWARENESS OF SEN AMONG THE GENERAL PUBLIC WITH THE AIM OF ENABLING BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF FAMILIES WITH SEN CHILDREN AND HOW THEY MAY BE SUPPORTED AND BUILDING COMMUNITY RELATIONSHIPS; · WORKING WITH SCHOOLS, EDUCATIONAL PROFESSIONALS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO PROVIDE OUTREACH SUPPORT FOR FAMILIES OF CHILDREN AND INDIVIDUALS WITH SEN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Penhurst House
352-356 Battersea Park Road
London
SW11 3BY
- Phone:
- 07985552887
- Email:
- info@senparenting.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window