THE GREEN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Green Foundation aims to assist individuals and families facing fuel poverty through our hardship grant. The Green Foundation also provides educational services with the aim of helping others become more sustainable.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter McGirr | Chair | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gaynor McGirr | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 19 October 2023 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 19 October 2023 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
3.1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO: (A) PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND THE PROMOTION OF RENEWABLE ENERGY; AND (B) PREVENT OR RELIEVE FUEL POVERTY BY PROVIDING GRANTS AND ASSISTANCE TO PEOPLE WHO ARE IN FUEL POVERTY OR AT RISK OF FUEL POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Coroners Court
Close
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 3RQ
- Phone:
- 03452222525
- Email:
- hello@thegreenfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window