CRONDALL BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In fulfilling the Purpose the Church has engaged in a range of activities either on its own or with others including: regular public worship, prayer, Bible study, preaching and teaching; the Communion of the Lords Supper at least once a month; the teaching, encouragement, welcome and inclusion of young people; nurture and growth of Christian disciples; giving and encouraging pastoral care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 13 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Lee | Trustee | 14 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Moira Elizabeth Clarke | Trustee | 14 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Andrew Warboys | Trustee | 14 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sean Retief | Trustee | 14 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Michelin | Trustee | 14 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.30k | £18.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.43k | £17.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 394 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 394 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 14 May 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 17 July 2023 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 08 May 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 08 May 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Borough
Crondall
Farnham
GU10 5NT
GU10 5NT
- Phone:
- 01252850382
- Email:
- crondallbaptist@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window