MIRFIELD FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL LEAVING SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support ex students of the Mirfield Free Grammar and Sixth Form to further their education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Kirklees
Governance
- 30 November 1984: Standard registration
- SCHOLARSHIP LEAVING FUND (Working name)
- MIRFIELD HIGH SCHOOL LEAVING SCHOLARSHIP FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Christian | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Mary Ryan | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS FIRTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £338 | £347 | £331 | £339 | £378 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 03 May 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 July 2023 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 06 June 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 May 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 30 JULY 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23 SEPTEMBER 1993.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN AWARDING TO PUPILS OF THE MIRFIELD FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL SCHOLARSHIPS OR GRANTS FOR FURTHER EDUCATION TENABLE AT ANY COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER INSTITUTIONS OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
SCHOOL CATCHMENT AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MIRFIELD FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL
KITSON HILL ROAD
MIRFIELD
WF14 9EZ
- Phone:
- 01924483660
- Email:
- mfg@themfg.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window