TENDERPAWS CAT RESCUE

Charity number: 1189581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS, SPECIFICALLY CATS, IN THE BLACKPOOL AND FYLDE DISTRICT BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED OF RESCUE, CARE AND ATTENTION. THIS CAN BE THROUGH ABANDONMENT, MALTREATMENT OR POOR CIRCUMSTANCES. WE ALSO ENSURE SAFE REHOMING, PROMOTE NEUTERING AND CHIPPING OF CATS IN OUR CARE.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024

Total income: £61,244
Total expenditure: £60,932

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 May 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine Meryem Chair 20 May 2020
None on record
Christina Walsh Trustee 20 May 2020
None on record
Mustafa Meryem Trustee 20 May 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £36.04k £57.42k £60.52k £61.24k
Total expenditure £22.17k £63.68k £69.26k £60.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2024 21 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2023 13 February 2024 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2023 13 February 2024 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2022 20 February 2023 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 10 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2021 11 February 2022 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
202-204 Lytham Road
BLACKPOOL
FY1 6EU
Phone:
01253283349
Website:

No information available