GLOBAL CUPCAKES OF HOPE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Global Cupcakes of HOPE UK provide relief and assistance to children, and their families, who are suffering from, or affected by, life threatening or life limiting diseases in the UK and South Africa, by the provision of grants to organizations working with children with life threatening or life limiting diseases, they do this through their love of baking Cupcakes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- South Africa
Governance
- 09 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynette Theresa Gatland | Trustee | 26 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marcelino Cipriano | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lindina Maria Da Cruz Pereira | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.21k | £0 | £10.20k | £20 | |
|
Total expenditure | £430 | £1.77k | £72 | £10.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 23 March 2025 | 357 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 23 March 2025 | 357 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PROVIDE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE TO CHILDREN, AND THEIR FAMILIES, WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM, OR ARE AFFECTED BY, LIFE THREATENING OR LIFE LIMITING DISEASES IN, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SOUTH AFRICA, BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS WORKING WITH CHILDREN WITH LIFE THREATENING OR LIFE LIMITING DISEASES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Kingsway Gardens
Chandler's Ford
EASTLEIGH
SO53 1FF
- Phone:
- +447784394290
- Email:
- dinapereira9691@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window