FRIENDS OF ST.ROSE'S

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raise for St. Rose's Stroud. Hold annual Christmas fayre. Annual garden fete. Annual classic car show.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 16 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 13 July 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elaine Fernandez Gutierrez Mrs | Chair | 12 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
John David Kyffin | Trustee | 12 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Goverd Miss | Trustee | 12 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 16/06/2021 | 16/06/2022 | 16/06/2023 | 16/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.59k | £10.97k | £11.45k | £14.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £170 | £3.10k | £19.19k | £3.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 16 June 2024 | 21 April 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 June 2023 | 03 May 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 June 2022 | 12 May 2023 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 June 2021 | 17 May 2022 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 June 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JUN 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. ROSES SPECIAL SCHOOL
STRATFORD LAWN
STROUD
GL5 4AP
- Phone:
- 01453763793
- Email:
- admin@stroses.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window