Accounts and annual returns LITTLE SNORING PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1192130
Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days
Accounts and TAR 03 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days
Annual return 03 July 2023 23 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 July 2023 23 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 03 July 2022 17 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 July 2022 17 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 03 July 2021 17 March 2023 318 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 July 2021 17 March 2023 318 days late Download Open in new window