PEACHES WOMB CANCER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to improve the lives of those with and at risk of womb cancer. To do this we raise money to allow us to improve public awareness of womb cancer, to support patients, to advocate for patients and to fund and promote vital research into womb cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Emma Jayne Crosbie | Chair | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Elizabeth Senn | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Deborah Helen Nott | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Pike | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chloe Barr | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eleanor Rose Jones | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Clarke | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helena Louise O'Flynn | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | 01/09/2023 | 01/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.09k | £32.76k | £65.53k | £62.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.71k | £10.45k | £36.63k | £63.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH AND IMPROVE THE EXPERIENCE OF WOMEN WITH OR AT RISK OF WOMB CANCER AND THEIR FAMILIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY; CARRYING OUT RESEARCH, RAISING AWARENESS AND THE PROVISION OF PATIENT EDUCATION AND SUPPORT SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clarke Nicklin House
4 Brooks Drive
Cheadle Royal Business Park
CHEADLE
Cheshire
SK8 3TD
- Phone:
- 07907018827
- Email:
- admin@peachestrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window