Trustees INTERNATIONAL SEISMOLOGICAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1188971
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Martin Vallee Trustee 13 July 2023
None on record
Adrienne Moseley Trustee 13 July 2023
None on record
Dr Yanru An Trustee 21 June 2021
None on record
Dr Xyoli Perez Campos Trustee 21 June 2021
None on record
Dr John Michael Kendall Trustee 13 April 2021
None on record
Seiji Tsuboi Trustee 04 January 2021
None on record
Johannes Schweitzer Trustee 08 April 2020
None on record
John Henry Woodhouse Trustee 08 April 2020
None on record