SUFFAH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Humanitarian relief projects and education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Bangladesh
- India
- Pakistan
Governance
- 06 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Umar Hayat | Chair | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||
SULTAN NIAZ UL HASSAN | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|||||||
Shah Nawaz Chaudhry | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £17.31k | £47.11k | £49.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £296 | £30.79k | £23.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN THE SUNNI SUFI TRADITION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PUBLICATION AND DISTRIBUTION OF LITERATURE. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS IN NEED ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AID AND MATERIALS AND THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF SCHOOLS. (C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, AND IN PARTICULAR, THOSE AFFECTED BY NATURAL CAUSES BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER ASSISTANCE INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO MEDICINES, SHELTER, FURNITURE, STATIONARY, FOOD, CLOTHING, SANITATION AND CLEAN DRINKING WATER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
142 LOCKWOOD ROAD
HUDDERSFIELD
HD1 3QX
- Phone:
- 07903255807
- Email:
- suffahfoundation@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window