GROOMBRIDGE MEN'S SHED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MEN AGED 18 OR OVER, WITHIN GROOMBRIDGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- Kent
Governance
- 05 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Litchfield | Chair | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ralph Lindeyer | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter George Lawne | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Richard James Bertram Hunt | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.78k | £63.24k | £26.82k | £12.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.30k | £62.16k | £27.84k | £8.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Mar 2020 as amended on 23 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MEN AGED 18 OR OVER, WITHIN GROOMBRIDGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET TO UNDERTAKE CREATIVE, PHYSICAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, LEARN OR PASS ON SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE, AND SUPPORT EACH OTHER SOCIALLY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER REASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Groombridge Mens Shed
Station Road
Groombridge
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
Kent
TN3 9QX
- Phone:
- 07354031981
- Email:
- jim@jimlitchfield.co.uk
- Website:
-
groombridgemensshed.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window