ROSSWAY GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rossway RDA was incorporated to promote the objects of The Riding for The Disabled Association incorporating Carriage Driving, a national charity registered under charity number 244108, by providing disabled people with the opportunity to ride and or carriage drive to benefit their health and well being in the vicinities of Buckinghamshre and Hertfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 16 March 2020: CIO registration
- 16 December 2020: Funds received from 1074350 ROSSWAY RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
- ROSSWAY GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED (ROSSWAY GROUP RDA) (Working name)
- ROSSWAY GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- ROSSWAY RDA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vivienne Bryan | Chair | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER DAVID WILTON | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Hazel Rymer | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Malcolm Elderfield | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Irene Caroline Purse | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather James | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Allison | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.99k | £6.43k | £20.11k | £14.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.38k | £13.55k | £6.75k | £23.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("RDA") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shardeloes Farm Equestrian Centre
Cherry Lane
Amersham
Bucks
HP7 0QF
- Phone:
- 01494433333
- Email:
- office@shardeloesfarm.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window