UNITED KINGDOM LITERACY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UKLA presents an informed national voice on language, literacy and communication issues. The Association organises conferences, training, publications and research in order to encourage dialogue between research and teaching and challenge and shape policy developments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

17 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 August 2020: CIO registration
- 04 October 2021: Funds received from 313714 UNITED KINGDOM LITERACY ASSOCIATION
- UKLA (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Debra Ann Myhill | Chair | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Prof Colin Harrison | Trustee | 09 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Kirsty Baker | Trustee | 06 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Simpson-Hargreaves | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Candice Satchwell | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Navan Nadrajan Govender | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lucy Jane Rodriguez Leon | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jo Tregenza | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Broad | Trustee | 07 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Olive Alexandra Douglas Gardner MA | Trustee | 07 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mary Lockwood | Trustee | 11 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clare Adele Dowdall | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roger Duncan McDonald | Trustee | 01 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Joy Elizabeth Court | Trustee | 19 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
David Glyn Reedy | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Prof Teresa Mary Cremin | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Lynda Jennifer Graham MA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £377.99k | £191.70k | £236.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £89.18k | £182.20k | £182.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT IS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN LITERACY
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Voluntary Action Leicestershire
9 Newarke Street
LEICESTER
LE1 5SN
- Phone:
- 07933724030
- Email:
- admin@ukla.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window