Trustees HAPPY HOOVES RDA RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING
Charity number: 1189349

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amelia Sisson | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iris Atherton | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Allinson | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Atherton | Trustee | 02 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
SARAH DADLEY | Trustee | 07 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Machell | Trustee | 07 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Toni Holland | Trustee | 07 December 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.