THE SWANNINGTON HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance, preservation and development of sites of industrial and environmental interest in and around the village of Swannington
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,130 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 20 November 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katrina Pentlow | Chair | 13 June 2014 |
|
|||||
Peter Sydney William Smitherman | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
IAN PAUL BAKER | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elaine Lincoln | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Owen Peter Bailey | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Temple | Trustee | 02 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karan Frances Sheffield | Trustee | 09 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLIFFORD ANTHONY ARIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.38k | £16.34k | £24.64k | £14.56k | £54.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.62k | £20.46k | £16.84k | £17.36k | £43.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £4.94k | £2.36k | £5.20k | £6.13k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 OCTOBER 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 2 JULY 1992 AND 29 OCTOBER 1997 as amended on 04 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE ESTABLISH AND PRESERVE FACILITIES IN THE VILLAGE OF SWANNINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURING AREA OF NORTH WEST LEICESTERSHIRE FOR STUDY AND RESEARCH OF INDUSTRIAL, AGRICULTURAL AND GENERAL ARCHAEOLOGY AND OTHER MATTERS OF LOCAL HISTORIC, ECOLOGICAL OR ENVIRONMENTAL INTEREST FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. B) TO ACQUIRE, MAINTAIN, PRESERVE AND DEVELOP SITES OF INTEREST INCLUDING BUILDINGS, MACHINERY AND OTHER ARTIFACTS FLORA AND FAUNA IN RESPECT OF THE MATTERS SPECIFIED AND TO PURSUE THE DEVELOPMENT, RESEARCH AND STUDY OF THE SAME AND C) TO ACQUIRE, ESTABLISH AND DEVELOP INDOOR AND OUTDOOR MUSEUMS IN RESPECT OF THE MATTERS SPECIFIED AND FOR THE DISPLAY AND EXHIBITION OF PLANT, MACHINERY, EFFECTS, EQUIPMENT, TOOLS, UTENSILS, PLANS, DRAWINGS, PHOTOGRAPHS AND ARTIFACTS OF THE SAME.
Area of benefit
VILLAGE OF SWANNINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 Main Street
Swannington
Coalville
LE67 8QN
- Phone:
- 07779275762
- Email:
- swanningtonchair@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window