PURBECK YOUTH MUSIC

Charity number: 1190008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Working in Purbeck to provide inspiration and opportunity to young people with instruments, concerts, workshops and music lessons.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £17,733
Total expenditure: £7,726

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 June 2020: CIO registration
  • 06 December 2023: Funds received from 287705 ISLE OF PURBECK ARTS CLUB
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TIMOTHY DUNCAN ARNOLD LRSM LTCL Chair 19 March 2020
None on record
Richard Anthony Brown Trustee 19 March 2020
None on record
JOAN EVELYN INGARFIELD Trustee 19 March 2020
BOURNEMOUTH SYMPHONY CHORUS
Received: On time
PURBECK ART WEEKS FESTIVAL
Received: On time
Janet Margaret Buckle Trustee 19 March 2020
ISLE OF PURBECK ARTS TRUST
Received: On time
Dilys Thomas Trustee 19 March 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £275 £48.94k £17.73k
Total expenditure £731 £4.91k £7.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 10 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 10 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 24 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 24 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Post Office Cottage
Worth Matravers
Swanage
BH19 3LQ
Phone:
01929439442