SHAHJALAL MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Place of Worship - Mosque , religious seminars and other activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 September 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAMIM MIAH | Chair | 29 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Habibur Rahman | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Syed Mostak Miah | Trustee | 21 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Delwar Hussain | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fazlu Miah | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Aziz | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Moklis Miah | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Foysal Choudhury | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
BOSHIR ALI | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emdadur Rahman | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Skeikh Mohammed Rayhan | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ISMAIL HUSSAIN | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Syed Maruf Ali | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/09/2021 | 04/09/2022 | 04/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.04k | £66.30k | £63.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.20k | £56.76k | £60.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £39.13k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 September 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 September 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 September 2022 | 09 July 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 September 2022 | 09 July 2023 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 September 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 September 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 17 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
“THE OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: TO ADVANCE THE SUFI, BARELVI AND FULTOLI DENOMINATIONS OF ISLAM, IN PARTICULAR WITH REFERENCE TO THE TENENTS OF SHARIAH, THE ISLAMIC LAWS AS EXPOUNDED BY THE HANAFI SUNNI JURISTIC SCHOOLS OF THOUGHT, MORE COMMONLY REFERRED TO AS THE AHLE- SUNNAH-WAL-JAMA’AH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) THE PROVISION OF A MOSQUE IN OLDHAM B) ADHERENCE TO THE HANAFI MADHAB IN ISLAMIC JURISPRUDENCE C) THE PRACTICE AND PROMOTION OF CONGREGATIONAL I’BADA’H INCLUDING NAMAZ, ZIKR, TASBIH, RECITATION OF QURAN, PIOUS ACTIVITIES AND REMEMBRANCE OF HOLY DAYS AND NIGHTS IN THE ISLAMIC CALENDAR. D) THE PROVISION OF ISLAMIC EDUCATION ACCORDING TO THE TEACHINGS OF AHLE SUNNAH WA’L JAMAAT AND SPECIFICALLY THE TEACHINGS ACCORDING TO THE SUFI, BARELVI AND FULTOLI DENOMINATIONS. E) THE PROVISION OF ISLAMIC CONFERENCES AND SEMINARS. F) THE PERFORMANCE OF 20 RAKAT TARAWEEH SALAH DURING THE HOLY MONTH OF RAMADAN G) THE PERFORMANCE OF DU’A AFTER EVERY FARD SALA’H AND JANAZA SALA’H. H) THE PRACTICE AND PROMOTION WITH DUE REVERENCE OF THE CELEBRATIONS AND REMEMBRANCE OF HOLY OCCASIONS SUCH AS LAILATUL ME’RAJ, LAILATUL BARAT, LAILATUL QADR, YAUME-E-ASHURA, EID-E-MILADUNNABI, URS MUBARAK OF GREAT AULIYAS SUCH AS GHAUS UL AZAM AND COMMEMORATION OF BADR SHUHADA AND PERFORMANCE OF MILAAD SHAREEF WITH QIYAM INSIDE THE MOSQUE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35-37 Stuart Street
OLDHAM
OL8 1SD
- Phone:
- 07976833113
- Email:
- shammiah@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window