Accounts and annual returns THE OLD FARMHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 1190849
Charity reporting is overdue by 454 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 454 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 454 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 May 2023 96 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 March 2022 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 March 2022 58 days late Download Open in new window