SPRINGFORTH INTERNATIONAL MINISTRY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
is a family church that provides worship services and bible teachings suitable for people of all ages. We are a local community of believers who have been called by God
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 19 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN MWATHI | Chair | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
simon njoroge | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES KINYANJUI | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
RACHAEL MBURU | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALICE MUHEDZI MURAYI | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
LUCY MUGO | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.82k | £50.70k | £51.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.25k | £16.98k | £19.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 62 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 62 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 09 August 2024 | 162 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 09 August 2024 | 162 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 26 May 2023 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 26 May 2023 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 13 December 2022 | 288 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 May 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPRINGFORTH Church
94 London Road
BAGSHOT
Surrey
GU19 5BT
- Phone:
- 01276409002
- Email:
- office@springforthchurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window