THE OAST COMMUNITY HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a community centre for recreation, education, sports, social and spiritual activities for use by groups and the local population.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Medway
Governance
- 20 August 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lloyd Cooke | Chair | 22 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Sarah Tyler | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Wayne Spring | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Deborah Janice Gorman | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Robin Halls | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Joyce Elizabeth Sanders | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Colin Paul Trevor Chapman | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Jason Leon Liddiard | Trustee | 20 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katharina Maryjane Hickman | Trustee | 20 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Martin Claringbold | Trustee | 20 August 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 February 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 February 2024 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2023 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2023 | 365 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
(1) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF RAINHAM AND WIGMORE AND THE MEDWAY UNITARY AUTHORITY, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. (2) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rainham & Wigmore Community Centre
Granary Close
Rainham
GILLINGHAM
ME8 7SG
- Phone:
- 07495095169
- Email:
- secretary@oasthub.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window