TORNADOES SPORTS EDUCATION AND LEISURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tornadoes Sports Education & Leisure (TSEL / Tornadoes) was formed in 2021, in order to transition the Unincorporated Charitable Association Tring Tornadoes Junior Sports Club into a legal structure appropriate for the size and scale of club and charity it has become. Tornadoes provides team sports for young people across Herts, Beds and Bucks, including Football, Futsal & Netball.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
116 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Hertfordshire
- Luton
Governance
- 02 October 2020: Standard registration
- TRING TORNADOES JUNIOR SPORTS CLUB (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN BAILEY | Chair | 20 February 2020 |
|
|||
Stuart Parker | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|||
Martin Pontoppidan | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £264.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £178.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Annual return not yet received | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 FEB 2020 as amended on 02 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY, ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO HELP AND EDUCATE CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE, AND ADULTS THROUGH ACTIVITIES TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES SUCH THAT THEY MAY GROW TO MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/ The Home Office
Pennyroyal Court
Station Road
TRING
Hertfordshire
HP23 5QY
- Phone:
- 07710658438
- Email:
- enquiries@tornadoes.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window