BRIDGING THE BAR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bridging the Bar is a charity that aims to support aspiring barristers from a range of statistically underrepresented groups at the Bar. We exist to bridge the gap between aspiring barristers from non-traditional backgrounds and the skills, experience and networks required to develop a thriving career at the Bar.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mass Ndow-Njie | Chair | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matheu Armel Swallow | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Mayers | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.87k | £47.95k | £83.46k | £133.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.25k | £37.48k | £102.93k | £94.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, ARE: THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONGST THOSE WHO SOCIALLY EXCLUDED DUE TO BEING MEMBERS OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY, AT THE BAR OF ENGLAND AND WALES BY: A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; AND D) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blackstone Chambers Ltd
Blackstone House
3 Garden Court
Temple
LONDON
EC4Y 9BW
- Phone:
- 03000300218
- Email:
- info@bridgingthebar.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window