MARKET WEIGHTON YOUTH ACTION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A charity that wants to bring provisions for the young people of Market Weighton and surrounding villages. We would like to provide a safe place for the young people to take part in fun events, learn life skills and relax with their friends.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 30 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison van der Kroon | Chair | 23 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Baxter | Trustee | 23 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ellen van der Kroon | Trustee | 23 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Marshall | Trustee | 23 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.29k | £2.30k | £21.24k | £15.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £9.71k | £11.56k | £10.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.00k | N/A | £9.70k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 April 2022 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 April 2022 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN MARKET WEIGHTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISUIRE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WISTERIA HOUSE
1A SANDHOLME
MARKET WEIGHTON
YORK
YO43 3ND
- Phone:
- 07739960845
- Email:
- alijvdk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window