Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF OAKFIELD PARK

Charity number: 1189613
Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 May 2025 468 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 May 2025 468 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 May 2025 833 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 May 2025 833 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 March 2022 29 days late Download Open in new window