DAVID PAWSON MINISTRY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity sponsors Bible teaching by means of literature, audio and video tapes, digital and other recordings, films, radio, television and the internet. In particular it supports the written and spoken works of the Rev J David Pawson for Christian teaching, training and instruction by authorising and licensing the translation, publication and dissemination of his works worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 May 2020: CIO registration
- 19 March 2024: Funds received from 1112737 DAVID PAWSON TEACHING TRUST
- DAVID PAWSON MINISTRY (Working name)
- DAVID PAWSON TEACHING TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy John Clarke | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN CONRAD DALLY | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
|||||
DAVID TIMOTHY REBBETTES | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.20k | £615.35k | £435.58k | £126.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £232.62k | £194.55k | £176.47k | £396.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £606.58k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £27 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £8.74k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £490.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £194.55k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.08k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £79.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE AND, IN PARTICULAR, BY: (A) SPONSORING BIBLE TEACHING BY MEANS OF AUDIO TAPES, VIDEO TAPES, DIGITAL AND OTHER RECORDINGS, FILMS, LITERATURE AND PUBLIC SPEAKING, INCLUDING RADIO AND TELEVISION BROADCASTING; (B) SUPPORTING THE MINISTRY OF THE REVEREND J. DAVID PAWSON THROUGH THE DISTRIBUTION OF AUDIO TAPES, VIDEO TAPES, WRITTEN MATERIAL AND OTHER COMMUNICATIONS MEDIA CONTAINING HIS SPOKEN AND WRITTEN WORK FOR CHRISTIAN TEACHING, TRAINING AND INSTRUCTION; (C) ESTABLISHING CHRISTIAN TEACHING AND TRAINING FACILITIES AND DISTRIBUTING CHRISTIAN TEACHING AND TRAINING MATERIAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Synegis House
21 Crockhamwell Road
Woodley
READING
RG5 3LE
- Phone:
- 01183320777
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window