CAMBRIDGE CANCER HELP CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve persons suffering from cancer and other illnesses and their families and friends, in particular by teaching methods of relaxation and by providing advice and counselling, with the object of improving the conditions of life of such persons and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 25 March 2020: CIO registration
- 04 May 2020: Funds received from 297886 CAMBRIDGE CANCER HELP CENTRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Jean Seaward | Trustee | 15 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Rowland Howell | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Gold | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arthur William Gibbons | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard John Dickenson | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Mackenzie | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edward Leslie Sage | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Hickman | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Jackson | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.92k | £38.92k | £38.92k | £56.84k | £73.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.94k | £42.94k | £94.91k | £35.82k | £70.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 27 June 2022 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 27 June 2022 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 25 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND OTHER ILLNESSES AND THE FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF SUCH PERSONS IN PARTICULAR BY TEACHING METHODS OF RELAXATION AND BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND COUNCELLING WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scotsdale Nursery & Garden Centre L
120 Cambridge Road
Great Shelford
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 5JT
- Phone:
- 01223840105
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window