FROME MARKET HEALTH HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides a drop in health screening facility for farmers, their employees and the rural community at large
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 01 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Brown | Chair | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Jackie Margaret Smith | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Watts MA.FEAE.TC | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucilla Nelson | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Diana Bourne | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Lorna Filby CMIOSH | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Hemmett MRICS | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Vickery ACA BSc | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £733 | £4.13k | £4.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.49k | £3.21k | £3.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE FARMING COMMUNITY THAT ATTEND THE FROME (STANDERWICK) LIVESTOCK MARKET, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ADVICE ON MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING ISSUES AND PROVIDING ACCESS TO PRACTITIONERS, ADVISORS AND PROFESSIONALS IN THE FIELD OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING AT THE FROME (STANDERWICK) LIVESTOCK MARKET
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yarnfield Cottage
108 Maiden Bradley
WARMINSTER
Wiltshire
BA12 7HY
- Phone:
- 01373830033
- Email:
- secretary@fmhh.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window