HOPE CHURCH VAUXHALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH. PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, INCLUDING: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
Governance
- 08 January 2021: CIO registration
- 01 May 2025: Funds received from 1201162 NEW LIFE ROEHAMPTON
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samuel George Gibb | Chair | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lloyd Nathan Williams | Trustee | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin James Croft | Trustee | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.36k | £113.85k | £99.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.58k | £84.20k | £78.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
3.1. THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE: 3.1.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND 3.1.2. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; PROVIDED THAT THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH PURPOSES MUST BE UNDERTAKEN IN A MANNER THAT IS CONSISTENT WITH THE DOCTRINAL DISTINCTIVES AND ETHICAL STATEMENTS AS MAY BE ADOPTED AND AMENDED BY THE CHURCH FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOPE CHURCH VAUXHALL
VAUXHALL CHRISTIAN CENTRE
105 TYERS STREET
LONDON
SE11 5HS
- Phone:
- 02075822618
- Email:
- sam@hopevauxhall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window