Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ASHTON HAYES CHURCH

Charity Number: 515847
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 17 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 15 March 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 16 March 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 13 March 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required