DRONFIELD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Member of the worldwide scouts movement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 01 March 1985: Standard registration
- DRONFIELD SCOUTS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS ANTHONY MARWOOD | Chair | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Graham Marwood | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Peter Godwin | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Brett Edenborough | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Roger Harrison | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Coomer Mason | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
CARRIE KAYE | Trustee | 12 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE ANNE STENTON | Trustee | 12 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD SPENCER WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARTHUR BRIAN PARKIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.79k | £12.98k | £1.98k | £13.38k | £27.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.60k | £5.82k | £10.51k | £39.59k | £24.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER-4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTITUTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPALS OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
91 Shakespeare Crescent
Dronfield
S18 1NB
- Phone:
- 01246419386
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window