THE OLI LEIGH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance such charitable purposes for the public benefit in England and Wales as the trustees see fit from time to time, in particular, but not limited to, the reduction in suicide rates among young people by developing and delivering bespoke suicide prevention training programmes in partnership with other organisations who work for the public benefit in the area of suicide prevention.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 April 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Leigh | Chair | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Luke Bodnar | Trustee | 09 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mirto Pieri | Trustee | 02 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Scott Leigh | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN JOSEPH SALAMON BA HONSACA | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.58k | £46.11k | £80.54k | £23.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.78k | £23.07k | £39.01k | £20.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE REDUCTION IN SUICIDE RATES AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE BY MAKING GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITIES AND NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATIONS WHO WORK FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE AREA OF SUICIDE PREVENTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Spring Close
BOREHAMWOOD
Hertfordshire
WD6 5HD
- Phone:
- 07979677625
- Email:
- hello@theolileightrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window