SHOOTING STARS GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation for the benefits of the inhabitants of Telford & Wrekin, Shropshire by the provision of facilities and coaching for gymnastics.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 02 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashlie Blake | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE ANNE BUTLER | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JENNIFER DOWNWARD | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.65k | £102.27k | £124.09k | £131.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.17k | £122.38k | £126.42k | £115.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.06k | £15.14k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TELFORD AND WREKIN, SHROPSHIRE, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND COACHING FOR GYMNASTICS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 14 HADLEY BUSINESS PARK
HADLEY PARK ROAD
LEEGOMERY
TELFORD
TF1 6PY
- Phone:
- 07905956644
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window