Accounts and annual returns SAFE HAVEN - CORNWALL

Charity number: 1188998
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 24 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 08 May 2025 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 03 July 2024 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 03 July 2024 64 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 01 August 2023 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 18 August 2023 110 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 September 2022 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 29 September 2022 152 days late Download Open in new window