THE GEORGE MALLORY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The George Mallory Foundation was established in January 2020 by Royal Artillery Officer, Captain Anthony Harrison, with an objective to design and create a national memorial to George. H. L. Mallory in his home village of Mobberley, Cheshire on the centenary of this death in 2024.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Captain Anthony Harrison BA | Chair | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Wenig | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemarie Colton BSc MRICS | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Unterhalter MSc FRICS | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Leach | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £3.68k | £1.16k | £37 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £273 | £482 | £76 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LIFE, ACHIEVEMENTS AND LEGACY OF BRITISH EXPLORER, GEORGE. H. L. MALLORY BY THE CONSTRUCTION OF A CENTRAL MEMORIAL AND SUPPORT TO NATIONAL COMMEMORATIONS. RAISING AWARENESS THROUGH PUBLIC TALKS, EVENTS AND BROADCASTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Plumley House
5 Moorcroft
Plumley
Cheshire
WA16 0UW
- Phone:
- 07917062489
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window