THE GELDER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity are to relieve poverty, need (age, disability, ill-health, financial or other disadvantage).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 March 2020: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WENDY DIANNE GELDER | Chair | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bates | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
KATE ELIZABETH BROWN | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.67k | £8.66k | £3.12k | £2.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.41k | £3.29k | £6.33k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 MAR 2020 as amended on 31 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO RELIEVE POVERTY, NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED IN THE BUILDING CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY IN LINCOLNSHIRE AND THE WIDOWS AND OTHER DEPENDENTS OF PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN SO EMPLOYED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GELDER GROUP LTD
TILLBRIDGE LANE
STURTON BY STOW
LINCOLN
LN1 2DS
- Phone:
- 01427788837
- Email:
- info@gelder.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window