CYLCH MEITHRIN A TI A FI PWLL, STRADE A SANDY

Charity number: 1188711
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is a pre school childcare facility. Offering childcare throught the medium of Welsh Language. We support families with in the surounding area running Parent and toddler sessions and Childcare sessions daily.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £5,537
Total expenditure: £15,757

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Carmarthenshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 March 2020: CIO registration
  • 05 February 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 05 February 2024: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £11.52k £5.54k
Total expenditure £7.95k £15.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 March 2023 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 March 2023 45 days late
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late