THE WATSON PLAYERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur Theatre Company
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derby City
Governance
- 08 January 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AIDAN REPTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lynne Chambers | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Burge | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Griffin | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Woolley | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jones | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Baird | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA SWIFT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR CHAMBERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT RODGERS | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANGELA BARRADELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.47k | £1.42k | £3.77k | £28.12k | £19.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.21k | £4.30k | £5.52k | £26.67k | £19.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/09/1984 AS AMENDED ON 14/05/1985 AS AMENDED ON 20/09/1985 AS AMENDED ON 12/02/2008 AS AMENDED ON 29/09/2009 AS AMENDED ON 09/10/2012 AS AMENDED ON 08/10/2013 as amended on 08 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS, TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS, TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE, OR A GENERAL MEETING, SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
89 MAINE DRIVE
CHADDESDEN
DERBY
DE21 6JY
- Phone:
- 01332678407
- Email:
- watson.players@ntlworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window