Trustees WATERWORKS MUSEUM - HEREFORD
Charity number: 515866

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Frances Phillips | Chair | 09 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Santry | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neil Drummond Turner | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Cammidge | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liam Perry Kirkham | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carole Franklin | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Impanni | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Glover | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kevin John Burrows | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Justyn Neil Atkins | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Cecil munn | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Prosser | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Phillip Harries | Trustee | 09 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr ADRIAN JOHN EYRE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR FRED SNELGROVE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER JOHN HEATON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.