LISA’S ARMY UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide emotional support and relief for sufferers of cancer and to help them with counselling and bereavement support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 06 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Perry | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Tuttle | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniel WELLS | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEANNA WELLS | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.15k | £18.85k | £7.10k | £8.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.89k | £12.08k | £6.35k | £8.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 01 March 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 01 March 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PEOPLE WHO LIVE IN THE SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND AND WHO HAVE TERMINAL CANCER BY PROVIDING COMFORT CARE PACKAGES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LANSDOWN HOUSE
HOUSTON WAY
FROME
BA11 3EX
- Phone:
- 07754720306
- Email:
- WELLSDEANNA1@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
WWW.LISASARMY.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window