OVERCOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Overcome helps improve digital mental health services, and broadens access to people who otherwise wouldn't be able to afford them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Salter | Chair | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jake Brindley | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.00k | £14.12k | £49.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £14.38k | £15.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY PRODUCING AN ALGORITHM WHICH SCHEDULES LEARNING ACCORDING TO PRINCIPLES DERIVED FROM EDUCATIONAL NEUROSCIENCE. 2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PROTECTION OF MENTAL HEALTH BY PROVIDING STEP BY STEP INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO MOST EFFICIENTLY COMBAT DEPRESSION AND ANXIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ELMCREST
ORCHARD ROAD
ARNSIDE
CARNFORTH
LA5 0DP
- Phone:
- 07340384792
- Email:
- enquires@overcome.org.uk
- Website:
-
overcome.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window