RHIGOS RUGBY FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities in Rhigos for the playing of amateur rugby union in accord with the rules and regulations of the Welsh Rugby Union and other amateur sports capable of providing healthy recreation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 28 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT CLIVE HARRIS | Chair | 28 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Richard Darren Harris | Trustee | 22 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Lewis | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Geraint Jenkins | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eifion Jenkins | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.18k | £180.45k | £159.27k | £143.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.20k | £176.57k | £169.04k | £144.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.14k | £3.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF AMATEUR RUGBY UNION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE RULES AND REGULATIONS OF THE WELSH RUGBY UNION AND SUCH OTHER AMATEUR SPORTS CAPABLE OF PROMOTING HEALTHY RECREATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RHIGOS RUGBY FOOTBALL CLUB
RHIGOS
ABERDARE
CF44 9HJ
- Phone:
- 01685811486
- Email:
- cliveharris60@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window