MANNA FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide emergency food parcel for those in immediate need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £28,285 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 25 March 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Kathleen Wood-Dow OBE | Chair | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Medcraff | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Ann Mardell | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Anne Humphris | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Jane Ransom | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.22k | £15.53k | £39.39k | £44.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.14k | £22.33k | £20.05k | £22.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.00k | £5.00k | £4.00k | £28.29k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED ON 23 MAR 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN THE BOROUGH OF SPELTHORNE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY (B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Peters Church Office
Laleham Road
STAINES-UPON-THAMES
TW18 2DX
- Phone:
- 07458302335
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window