MONMOUTHSHIRE, BRECON AND ABERGAVENNY CANALS TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1/ Organise and run canal awareness days 2/ Organise and run social events based on canals 3/ Give talks to interested groups on the local canals 4/ Organise and run canal restoration projects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Caerphilly
- Monmouthshire
- Newport City
- Powys
- Torfaen
Governance
- 07 January 1985: Standard registration
- MON AND BREC CANALS TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Alfred Collier | Chair | 24 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rick Longford | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Allan Coldwell | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Dommett MBE | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Collier | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.02k | £90.00k | £59.24k | £82.21k | £154.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.72k | £53.00k | £67.28k | £57.37k | £148.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £47.63k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.34k | N/A | £33.80k | £35.85k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2023 | 361 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 December 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 December 2021 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/08/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RESTORATION OF (A) THE MONMOUTHSHIRE CANAL RUNNING FROM NEWPORT TO PONTYMOILE IN THE COUNTY OF GWENT AND ANY BRANCHES THEREOF AND (B) THE BRECON AND ABERGAVENNY CANAL RUNNING FROM BRECON IN THE COUNTY OF POWYS TO PONTYMOILE IN THE COUNTY OF GWENT AND ANY BRANCHES THEREOF AND WATERWAYS ASSOCIATED WITH THEM (HEREINAFTER TOGETHER CALLED "THE WATERWAY") TO GOOD NAVIGABLE ORDER AND TO MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE THE WATERWAY FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fourteen Locks Canal Centre
Rogerstone
NEWPORT
NP10 9GN
- Phone:
- 01633892167
- Email:
- fourteenlocks@mbact.org.uk
- Website:
-
mbact.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window