GYNAE-ONCOLOGY RESEARCH AND CLINICAL EXCELLENCE ("GRACE")

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GRACE uses its funds to raise awareness, purchase equipment, fund research and has contributed to the development of a centre of excellence for the treatment of gynaecological cancers, with a growing national and international reputation. It primarily supports a clinical networks across Surrey, Sussex and Hampshire delivering equity of high-quality care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 June 2020: CIO registration
- 31 December 2021: Funds received from 1109997 GYNAE-ONCOLOGY RESEARCH AND CLINICAL EXCELLENCE
- GRACE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON BUTLER-MANUEL | Chair | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Elizabeth Vellin | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jayanta Chatterjee | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Christian John Wells | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WILLACY | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Agnieszka Michael | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.12k | £73.04k | £110.14k | £78.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.74k | £138.25k | £98.27k | £83.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PATIENTS WITH GYNAECOLOGICAL CANCER THROUGH RESEARCH, HEALTH EDUCATION AND TRAINING, AND PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SUPPORT RESOURCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Surrey County Hospital
Egerton Road
Guildford
GU2 7XX
- Phone:
- 01306730872
- Email:
- info@grace-charity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window