Financial history CANTONIAN HIGH SCHOOL GENERAL FUND

Charity number: 515885
Charity reporting is overdue by 679 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £25.28k £57.65k £44.51k £27.63k £1.45k
Total expenditure £44.28k £50.13k £46.34k £39.01k £21.97k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A