Accounts and annual returns OWL BLUE

Charity Number: 1191314
Charity reporting is up to date (208 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 January 2025 208 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 24 January 2025 208 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 July 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 12 July 2023 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 09 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window